U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03192
  • Case Name: Webb v. Buffaloe et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • October 07, 2022: [Default Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 11, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 17, 2022: [Expedite]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 17, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.