U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02106
  • Case Name: Creasman v. Ramos et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice-other]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • October 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • October 03, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 03, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 03, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.