U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01572-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 14, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.