U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02107
  • Case Name: Gordon v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • August 25, 2022: [Declaration]
  • August 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 25, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 25, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.