U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01505-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caffrey, III
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 18, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 18, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.