U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fortes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 05, 2022: [Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Bond ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.