U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01532-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gudger
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • September 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.