U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03195
  • Case Name: Aikens v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Document]
  • November 10, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • July 12, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 28, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 24, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.