U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03194
  • Case Name: Scott v. Strickland et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 28, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 28, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 24, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.