U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03193
  • Case Name: Friday v. Bradley et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 11, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.