U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03196
  • Case Name: Darcy v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Entry of Default]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 16, 2022: [Reconsideration]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Response to Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.