U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03198
  • Case Name: Henderson v. Wake County Sheriff's Office
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 06, 2022: [Motion No Longer Submitted]
  • July 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 05, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.