U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bustamante
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 08, 2022: [Dismiss ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 30, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.