U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cuppett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2022: [Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Bond ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 23, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 23, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.