U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 08, 2022: [Dismiss ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.