U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gates
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 17, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 23, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.