U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02110
  • Case Name: Ballard v. Kittrell et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 13, 2023: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 08, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 08, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2022: [Response to Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.