U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02109
  • Case Name: Ingram v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 14, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 14, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 05, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.