U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03200
  • Case Name: Barnett v. Mouring
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [USCA Order]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 01, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 27, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 24, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.