U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01580-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguierre-Garcia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 25, 2022: [Document]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 07, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 26, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 26, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.