U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hicks
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.