U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03201
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Holmes et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Text Order]
  • May 20, 2025: [Order]
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice-other]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 17, 2023: [Entry of Default]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Default]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice-Failure to Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Correction]
  • August 30, 2022: [Appear]
  • August 29, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summons Reissued]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice-other]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • June 27, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.