U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCampbell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • October 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 27, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.