U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01597-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 28, 2022: [Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • June 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 27, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.