U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01596-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 10, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 10, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.