U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01595-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soi
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion for Revocation of Probation]
October, 2022
  • October 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 10, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 10, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.