U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01594-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 10, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 10, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 27, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.