U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01584-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joseph
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • November 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 09, 2022: [Document]
  • July 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 26, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 26, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.