U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01581-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bufford
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 26, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 26, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.