U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01599-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aragon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 05, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.