U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01598-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rowe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 30, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.