U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03202
  • Case Name: Whitehead v. LaFluer et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 19, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 19, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.