U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02113
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Lawrence
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stipulation]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Stay]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Stay]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 24, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • August 23, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • July 21, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 20, 2022: [Appoint Expert]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.