U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02114
  • Case Name: Andrews v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 09, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 09, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 09, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • October 14, 2022: [Expedite]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 29, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.