U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03206
  • Case Name: Hinton v. Dever et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.