U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03205
  • Case Name: Foye v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 19, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 19, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 05, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 29, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.