U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03204
  • Case Name: Taylor v. New Hanover County Detention Center
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 29, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.