U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02115
  • Case Name: DeCory v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 18, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.