U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03207
  • Case Name: Nordan v. Carson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion No Longer Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 10, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • March 07, 2025: [Seal Document]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice-other]
  • October 11, 2024: [Motion Referred]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time-Other]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2023: [Rule 26(f) Report (joint)]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order for Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 26, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 25, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 07, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 29, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.