U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03209
  • Case Name: Williams v. Kelly et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 05, 2023: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • October 28, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 27, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.