U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03216
  • Case Name: Joiner v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 29, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • August 29, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response to Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 11, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.