U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03214
  • Case Name: Tunstall v. Davis et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [USCA PLRA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • October 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 24, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 26, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.