U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00017
  • Case Name: USA v. HOWARD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Garnishment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • August 02, 2022: [Garnishment]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Status Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • July 05, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.