U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03217
  • Case Name: McGriff El v. Mozingo et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Declaration]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Document]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 15, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 09, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.