U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02119
  • Case Name: Brewer v. Scarantino
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Document]
  • November 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 03, 2022: [Strike]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 14, 2022: [Document]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 06, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • October 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 06, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 06, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 06, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 16, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 01, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Document]
  • July 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 06, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.