U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03218
  • Case Name: Cole v. Ishee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 06, 2023: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 05, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • December 05, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 19, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 19, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 08, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 06, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.