U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 26, 2022: [Rule 5 - Transfer Out]
  • July 26, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 14, 2022: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Identity Hearing-Rule 5]
  • July 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • July 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 06, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.