U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cardenas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Correction]
  • August 05, 2022: [Document]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2022: [Discovery ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • July 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.