U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kocienski
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Bond ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.