U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01615-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Branch
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • July 13, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.